Directors of Navketan Industrial Construction
Directors - NAVKETAN INDUSTRIAL CONSTRUCTION PVT LTD
The company has 5 directors and no reported key management personnel.
The longest serving director currently on board is Kantilal Champalal Kothari who was appointed on 01 February, 1979. Kantilal Champalal Kothari has been on the board for more than 45 years. The most recently appointed director is Rajendra Jawaharlal Darda, who was appointed on 01 March, 2017.
Karan Rajendra Darda has the largest number of other directorships with a seat at a total of 31 companies. In total, the company is connected to 48 other companies through its directors.
NAME | DESIGNATION | APPOINTMENT DATE | |
---|---|---|---|
RISHI RAJENDRA DARDA | Director | 15 July, 1992 | Other directorships - SEVEN SQUARES BUILDERS AND DEVELOPERS LLP, NUBIC BUILDERS & DEVELOPERS LLP, CORALBELLS REALTORS LLP, ANCIENT AGRICULTURE PRIVATE LIMITED, ANCIENT CONCRETE PRODUCTS PRIVATE LIMITED, ASERA INFRASTRUCTURE PRIVATE LIMITED, MOGRA SCANGRAPH PRIVATE LIMITED, ASERA POWER PRIVATE LIMITED, DARDA PRINTOCRATS PRIVATE LIMITED, MARISO CONSTRUCTION PRIVATE LIMITED, ECOFLY AGRICULTURE LLP, FC VYAPAR PRIVATE LIMITED, SAKSHI AGRICULTURE LLP, SUJASH AGRICULTURE LLP, VATESHWAR AGRICULTURE LLP, VOGUE BUILDERS AND DEVELOPERS LLP, GREAT ASERA INFRASTRUCTURE LLP, DARDA INVESTMENT AND PROPERTIES PVT LTD, AIRWAVE ENTERTAINMENT PRIVATE LIMITED, PATLIPUTRA EXPORTS PRIVATE LIMITED, SOHAM AGRICULTURE PRIVATE LIMITED, BLINK ENTERPRISES PRIVATE LIMITED, IGNITE PROPERTIES PRIVATE LIMITED, LOKMAT ENTERTAINMENT PRIVATE LIMITED, LOKMAT MEDIA PRIVATE LIMITED, IBN LOKMAT NEWS PRIVATE LIMITED, GOOD2GREAT INDUSTRIES PRIVATE LIMITED, KRISHNAL INFRACARE LLP, |
PREMCHAND CHAMPALAL KOTHARI | Director | 30 November, 1991 | Other directorships - KGA HOSPITALITY PRIVATE LIMITED, LENTIL INVESTMENTS PRIVATE LIMITED, KOTHARI REALTY PRIVATE LIMITED, VAJRA INDUSTRIES PRIVATE LIMITED, HOTEL SHRINGAR PVT LTD, MAGNOLIA HOSPITALITY PRIVATE LIMITED, NEW RAJASTHAN BUILDERS PVT LTD, SUNNY TOURISM PRIVATE LIMITED, |
KARAN RAJENDRA DARDA | Director | 15 January, 2004 | Other directorships - SEVEN SQUARES BUILDERS AND DEVELOPERS LLP, NUBIC BUILDERS & DEVELOPERS LLP, DEEPTI AGRICULTURE PRIVATE LIMITED, SILVERSHINE VENTURES PRIVATE LIMITED, BLINK COOPER PRIVATE LIMITED, ANCIENT CONCRETE PRODUCTS PRIVATE LIMITED, MARINE LANDMARKS PRIVATE LIMITED, SMRUTI VENTURES PRIVATE LIMITED, MOGRA SCANGRAPH PRIVATE LIMITED, SHREYA COOPER PRIVATE LIMITED, PRITHVI PRAKASHAN PRIVATE LIMITED, NAVKETAN TOURS AND TRAVELS PVT LTD, DARDA PRINTOCRATS PRIVATE LIMITED, MARISO CONSTRUCTION PRIVATE LIMITED, ECOFLY AGRICULTURE LLP, FC VYAPAR PRIVATE LIMITED, REGAL PUBLICATIONS PRIVATE LIMITED, SAKSHI AGRICULTURE LLP, SUJASH AGRICULTURE LLP, VATESHWAR AGRICULTURE LLP, VOGUE BUILDERS AND DEVELOPERS LLP, DARDA INVESTMENT AND PROPERTIES PVT LTD, AUDIT BUREAU OF CIRCULATIONS, PATLIPUTRA EXPORTS PRIVATE LIMITED, SOHAM AGRICULTURE PRIVATE LIMITED, IGNITE PROPERTIES PRIVATE LIMITED, LOKMAT MEDIA PRIVATE LIMITED, THE INDIAN NEWSPAPER SOCIETY., GOOD2GREAT INDUSTRIES PRIVATE LIMITED, KRISHNAL INFRACARE LLP, |
KANTILAL CHAMPALAL KOTHARI | Director | 01 February, 1979 | Other directorships - LENTIL INVESTMENTS PRIVATE LIMITED, KOTHARI REALTY PRIVATE LIMITED, MAGNOLIA HOSPITALITY PRIVATE LIMITED, NEW RAJASTHAN BUILDERS PVT LTD, SUNNY TOURISM PRIVATE LIMITED, BOMBAY FIBRE INDUSTRIES PRIVATE LIMITED, |
RAJENDRA JAWAHARLAL DARDA | Director | 01 March, 2017 | No other directorships |
NAME | DESIGNATION | APPOINTMENT DATE | |||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RISHI RAJENDRA DARDA | Director | 15 July, 1992 | View other directorships | ||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
|
|||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
PREMCHAND CHAMPALAL KOTHARI | Director | 30 November, 1991 | View other directorships | ||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
|
|||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
KARAN RAJENDRA DARDA | Director | 15 January, 2004 | View other directorships | ||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
|
|||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
KANTILAL CHAMPALAL KOTHARI | Director | 01 February, 1979 | View other directorships | ||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
|
|||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
RAJENDRA JAWAHARLAL DARDA | Director | 01 March, 2017 | No other directorships | ||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
|
Director
Director
Director
Director
Director
Company360 plans
Know more about your vendors, clients and competitors.
Financials, scores, ratios, excels, reports and more.
@ INR 9000/quarter
Join our newsletter
Tofler, TWS Systems Private Limited and its officers respect the Intellectual Property Rights of all people. Tofler makes no claim of ownership or affiliation with any trademark (REGISTERED OR UNREGISTERED) that forms part of any Company/LLP name listed on this page. Trademarks, if any, listed on this page belong to their respective owners. Read More