Directors of Gymkhana Club Services 1866 Limited
Directors - GYMKHANA CLUB SERVICES 1866 LIMITED
The company has 9 directors and no reported key management personnel.
The longest serving director currently on board is Bijendra Agarwal who was appointed on 10 October, 2016. Bijendra Agarwal has been on the board for more than 7 years. The most recently appointed directors are Rajeev Singh and Kumar Kunjan Santosh, who were appointed on 08 September, 2022.
Bijendra Agarwal has the largest number of other directorships with a seat at a total of 14 companies. In total, the company is connected to 25 other companies through its directors.
NAME | DESIGNATION | APPOINTMENT DATE | |
---|---|---|---|
SURENDRA KHANDELWAL | Director | 14 April, 2018 | Other directorships - LAXMI NARAYAN BUILDCON PRIVATE LIMITED, CHAHAT BUILDCON REAL ESTATE PRIVATE LIMITED, |
RAJENDRA SINGH RATHORE | Director | 14 April, 2018 | Other directorships - KING ARTHUR HOSPITALITY AND SOLUTIONS RAJASTHAN PRIVATE LIMITED, ANCIENT PALACE AND RESORTS PRIVATE LIMITED, AJMER GYMKHANA CLUB LIMITED, RANI BAGH FARMS PRIVATE LIMITED, |
RAJEEV SINGH | Director | 08 September, 2022 | Other directorships - NEELU MULTI SERVICES PRIVATE LIMITED, NRICITY LANDBASE PRIVATE LIMITED, NRI CITY MANSION PRIVATE LIMITED, SPIRITUAL CHARDHAM PRIVATE LIMITED, |
PRAVEEN MODI | Director | 21 June, 2022 | Other directorships - DEHRADUN GYMKHANA CLUB LIMITED, |
BIJENDRA AGARWAL | Director | 10 October, 2016 | Other directorships - OFFICERS CLUB LLP, BIKANER GYMKHANA CLUB LIMITED, NRI CITY BUILDERS PRIVATE LIMITED, AJMER GYMKHANA CLUB LIMITED, ROHINI GYMKHANA CLUB LIMITED, GHAZIABAD GYMKHANA CLUB LIMITED, PUNE GYMKHANA CLUB LIMITED, CHANDIGARHGYMKHANA CLUB LIMITED, HARIDWAR GYMKHANA CLUB LIMITED, NRI GYMKHANA CLUB (PATNA) PRIVATE LIMITED, AMARAVATI GYMKHANA CLUB LIMITED, SHIRDI GYMKHANA CLUB LIMITED, GYMKHANA CLUB LIMITED, |
RUCHI MATHUR | Director | 14 April, 2018 | Other directorships - AJMER GYMKHANA CLUB LIMITED, |
KUMAR KUNJAN SANTOSH | Director | 08 September, 2022 | Other directorships - GYMKHANA SALES PRIVATE LIMITED, SAHASA ADVENTURE AND HOSPITALITY PRIVATE LIMITED, |
JYOTI ARYA | Director | 21 June, 2022 | No other directorships |
HIMANSHU | Director | 21 June, 2022 | No other directorships |
NAME | DESIGNATION | APPOINTMENT DATE | |||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SURENDRA KHANDELWAL | Director | 14 April, 2018 | View other directorships | ||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
|
|||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
RAJENDRA SINGH RATHORE | Director | 14 April, 2018 | View other directorships | ||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
|
|||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
RAJEEV SINGH | Director | 08 September, 2022 | View other directorships | ||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
|
|||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
PRAVEEN MODI | Director | 21 June, 2022 | View other directorships | ||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
|
|||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
BIJENDRA AGARWAL | Director | 10 October, 2016 | View other directorships | ||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
|
|||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
RUCHI MATHUR | Director | 14 April, 2018 | View other directorships | ||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
|
|||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
KUMAR KUNJAN SANTOSH | Director | 08 September, 2022 | View other directorships | ||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
|
|||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
JYOTI ARYA | Director | 21 June, 2022 | No other directorships | ||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
|
|||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
HIMANSHU | Director | 21 June, 2022 | No other directorships | ||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
|
Director
Director
Director
Director
Director
Director
Director
Director
Director
Company360 plans
Know more about your vendors, clients and competitors.
Financials, scores, ratios, excels, reports and more.
@ INR 9000/quarter
Join our newsletter
Tofler, TWS Systems Private Limited and its officers respect the Intellectual Property Rights of all people. Tofler makes no claim of ownership or affiliation with any trademark (REGISTERED OR UNREGISTERED) that forms part of any Company/LLP name listed on this page. Trademarks, if any, listed on this page belong to their respective owners. Read More