YOGITA AGARWAL
Yogita Agarwal is registered with the Ministry of Corporate Affairs as a Director in Indian Companies. The DIN (Director Identification Number) of Yogita Agarwal is 02747937.
Currently, he/she serves as a director in 2 Companies in India. The companies he/she is associated with are from various industries such as Trading etc.
Following are the directorship details of Yogita Agarwal
NAME | INDUSTRY | INCORP. YEAR | COMP. STATUS | DESIGNATION | DATE OF APPOINTMENT | AS ON | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ALANKAR DISTRIBUTORS PVT LTD | Trading | 1996 | Active | Director | 28 August 2009 | 10 July 2022 | Buy financial reports |
OMEGA DISTRIBUTORS PVT LTD | Trading | 1996 | Active | Director | 26 December 2009 | 7 August 2023 | Buy financial reports |
Other individuals who might be associated with Yogita Agarwal are Nandlal Agarwal.
FAQ - Yogita Agarwal
-
How many companies is he/she appointed as director?
Yogita Agarwal serves as a director in 2 Companies in India.
-
What is the DIN of Yogita Agarwal?
The DIN of Yogita Agarwal is 02747937.
-
Which is the longest holding directorship of Yogita Agarwal?
The longest directorship of Yogita Agarwal is with ALANKAR DISTRIBUTORS PVT LTD.
*Industry classification is inferred. If the company has changed line of business without intimating the Registrar or is a diversified business, classification may be different. We make no warranties about accuracy of industry classification
Tofler, TWS Systems Private Limited and its officers respect the Intellectual Property Rights of all people. Tofler makes no claim of ownership or affiliation with any trademark (REGISTERED OR UNREGISTERED) that forms part of any Company/LLP name listed on this page. Trademarks, if any, listed on this page belong to their respective owners. Read More