YASHPAL NAGAR
Yashpal Nagar is a businessman and the husband of Debi Prasad Lenka, who is also a director of both Golden Eyes Show Biz Private Limited and Vipul Chemicals (India) Private Limited.
He is currently the director of Maya Properties Private . Ltd., a company that provides business services and is located in New Delhi. He was appointed as the director on 28 November 2014.
He was previously the director of Golden Eyes Show Biz Private Limited, a company that was involved in the production and distribution of films and television shows. He was the director from 16 March 2011 to 30 September 2016. He resigned from his position due to personal reasons. He has a total of two active and previous appointments as a director in different companies.
His educational background is not available in the web search results, but he may have some degree or qualification in business or management. He has a son named Vishal Mourya, who is also a director of Golden Eyes Show Biz Private Limited.
Yashpal Nagar is registered with the Ministry of Corporate Affairs as a Director in Indian Companies. The DIN (Director Identification Number) of Yashpal Nagar is 06975626.
Currently, he/she serves as a director in 2 Companies in India. The companies he/she is associated with are from various industries such as Business Services, Trading etc.
Following are the directorship details of Yashpal Nagar
NAME | INDUSTRY | DESIGNATION | DATE OF APPOINTMENT | |
---|---|---|---|---|
MAYA PROPERTIES PRIVATE . LTD. | Business Services | Director | 28 November 2014 | Buy financial reports |
SPAR EXIM PRIVATE LIMITED | Trading | Director | 17 February 2014 | Buy financial reports |
Other individuals who might be associated with Yashpal Nagar are Sunil Sikka, Shilpi Jain, Prashant Jain, Gaurang Batra.
*Industry classification is inferred. If the company has changed line of business without intimating the Registrar or is a diversified business, classification may be different. We make no warranties about accuracy of industry classification
Tofler, TWS Systems Private Limited and its officers respect the Intellectual Property Rights of all people. Tofler makes no claim of ownership or affiliation with any trademark (REGISTERED OR UNREGISTERED) that forms part of any Company/LLP name listed on this page. Trademarks, if any, listed on this page belong to their respective owners. Read More