VINOD PAUL
Vinod Paul is registered with the Ministry of Corporate Affairs as a Director in Indian Companies. The DIN (Director Identification Number) of Vinod Paul is 07611652.
Currently, he/she serves as a director in 2 Companies in India. The companies he/she is associated with are from various industries such as Trading, Business Services etc.
Following are the directorship details of Vinod Paul
NAME | INDUSTRY | INCORP. YEAR | COMP. STATUS | DESIGNATION | DATE OF APPOINTMENT | AS ON | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARKETIA INDIA PRIVATE LIMITED | Trading | 2021 | Active | Director | 15 March 2021 | 6 September 2023 | Buy financial reports |
TROMPET MEDIA PRIVATE LIMITED | Business Services | 2016 | Active | Director | 3 November 2016 | 24 November 2023 | Buy financial reports |
Other individuals who might be associated with Vinod Paul are Mila Vinod, Sharon Ramesh Alakkadan Kavinissery.
FAQ - Vinod Paul
-
How many companies is he/she appointed as director?
Vinod Paul serves as a director in 2 Companies in India.
-
What is the DIN of Vinod Paul?
The DIN of Vinod Paul is 07611652.
-
Which is the longest holding directorship of Vinod Paul?
The longest directorship of Vinod Paul is with TROMPET MEDIA PRIVATE LIMITED.
*Industry classification is inferred. If the company has changed line of business without intimating the Registrar or is a diversified business, classification may be different. We make no warranties about accuracy of industry classification
Tofler, TWS Systems Private Limited and its officers respect the Intellectual Property Rights of all people. Tofler makes no claim of ownership or affiliation with any trademark (REGISTERED OR UNREGISTERED) that forms part of any Company/LLP name listed on this page. Trademarks, if any, listed on this page belong to their respective owners. Read More