VIKAS PATIDAR
Vikas Patidar is registered with the Ministry of Corporate Affairs as a Director in Indian Companies. The DIN (Director Identification Number) of Vikas Patidar is 01088894.
Currently, he/she serves as a director in 2 Companies in India. The companies he/she is associated with are from various industries such as Finance etc.
Following are the directorship details of Vikas Patidar
NAME | INDUSTRY | INCORP. YEAR | COMP. STATUS | DESIGNATION | DATE OF APPOINTMENT | AS ON | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GAJRAJ FINVEST PRIVATE LIMITED | Finance | 1994 | Active | Director | 10 December 2004 | 23 January 2020 | Buy financial reports |
M.L.SECURITIES AND FINANCE PVT LTD | Finance | 1995 | Active | Director | 20 March 2005 | 2 July 2022 | Buy financial reports |
Other individuals who might be associated with Vikas Patidar are Mukesh Patidar, Harinarayan Patidar.
FAQ - Vikas Patidar
-
How many companies is he/she appointed as director?
Vikas Patidar serves as a director in 2 Companies in India.
-
What is the DIN of Vikas Patidar?
The DIN of Vikas Patidar is 01088894.
-
Which is the longest holding directorship of Vikas Patidar?
The longest directorship of Vikas Patidar is with GAJRAJ FINVEST PRIVATE LIMITED.
*Industry classification is inferred. If the company has changed line of business without intimating the Registrar or is a diversified business, classification may be different. We make no warranties about accuracy of industry classification
Tofler, TWS Systems Private Limited and its officers respect the Intellectual Property Rights of all people. Tofler makes no claim of ownership or affiliation with any trademark (REGISTERED OR UNREGISTERED) that forms part of any Company/LLP name listed on this page. Trademarks, if any, listed on this page belong to their respective owners. Read More