VIJAY KUMAR VARMA
Vijay Kumar Varma is registered with the Ministry of Corporate Affairs as a Director in Indian Companies. The DIN (Director Identification Number) of Vijay Kumar Varma is 00155244.
Currently, he/she serves as a director in 2 Companies in India. The companies he/she is associated with are from various industries such as Trading, Finance etc.
Following are the directorship details of Vijay Kumar Varma
NAME | INDUSTRY | INCORP. YEAR | COMP. STATUS | DESIGNATION | DATE OF APPOINTMENT | AS ON | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
OPULENT AGENTS PVT LTD | Trading | 1996 | Active | Director | 25 January 2010 | 15 February 2023 | Buy financial reports |
INTERFACE VANIJYA PVT LTD | Finance | 1996 | Amalgamated | Director | 18 June 2001 | 13 September 2023 | Buy financial reports |
Other individuals who might be associated with Vijay Kumar Varma are Prakash Baid.
FAQ - Vijay Kumar Varma
-
How many companies is he/she appointed as director?
Vijay Kumar Varma serves as a director in 2 Companies in India.
-
What is the DIN of Vijay Kumar Varma?
The DIN of Vijay Kumar Varma is 00155244.
-
Which is the longest holding directorship of Vijay Kumar Varma?
The longest directorship of Vijay Kumar Varma is with INTERFACE VANIJYA PVT LTD.
*Industry classification is inferred. If the company has changed line of business without intimating the Registrar or is a diversified business, classification may be different. We make no warranties about accuracy of industry classification
Tofler, TWS Systems Private Limited and its officers respect the Intellectual Property Rights of all people. Tofler makes no claim of ownership or affiliation with any trademark (REGISTERED OR UNREGISTERED) that forms part of any Company/LLP name listed on this page. Trademarks, if any, listed on this page belong to their respective owners. Read More