VIDHU JAIN
Vidhu Jain is registered with the Ministry of Corporate Affairs as a Director in Indian Companies. The DIN (Director Identification Number) of Vidhu Jain is 07782985.
Currently, he/she serves as a director in 2 Companies in India. The companies he/she is associated with are from various industries such as Trading, Business Services etc.
Following are the directorship details of Vidhu Jain
NAME | INDUSTRY | INCORP. YEAR | COMP. STATUS | DESIGNATION | DATE OF APPOINTMENT | AS ON | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RAM LAL INDER LAL PRIVATE LIMITED | Trading | 1997 | Active | Director | 22 April 2017 | 13 September 2023 | Buy financial reports |
INLABS LIFESCIENCES PRIVATE LIMITED | Business Services | 2022 | Active | Director | 25 January 2022 | 17 July 2024 | Buy financial reports |
Other individuals who might be associated with Vidhu Jain are Deepak Jain, Kanika Talwar.
FAQ - Vidhu Jain
-
How many companies is he/she appointed as director?
Vidhu Jain serves as a director in 2 Companies in India.
-
What is the DIN of Vidhu Jain?
The DIN of Vidhu Jain is 07782985.
-
Which is the longest holding directorship of Vidhu Jain?
The longest directorship of Vidhu Jain is with RAM LAL INDER LAL PRIVATE LIMITED.
*Industry classification is inferred. If the company has changed line of business without intimating the Registrar or is a diversified business, classification may be different. We make no warranties about accuracy of industry classification
Tofler, TWS Systems Private Limited and its officers respect the Intellectual Property Rights of all people. Tofler makes no claim of ownership or affiliation with any trademark (REGISTERED OR UNREGISTERED) that forms part of any Company/LLP name listed on this page. Trademarks, if any, listed on this page belong to their respective owners. Read More