VEENA TIBREWAL
Veena Tibrewal is registered with the Ministry of Corporate Affairs as a Director in Indian Companies. The DIN (Director Identification Number) of Veena Tibrewal is 07110582.
Currently, he/she serves as a director in 2 Companies in India. The companies he/she is associated with are from various industries such as Business Services, etc.
Following are the directorship details of Veena Tibrewal
NAME | INDUSTRY | INCORP. YEAR | COMP. STATUS | DESIGNATION | DATE OF APPOINTMENT | AS ON | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
STC CONSULTANCY PRIVATE LIMITED | Business Services | 2010 | Active | Director | 2 March 2015 | 12 October 2022 | Buy financial reports |
STC CONSULTANCY LLP | 2023 | Inactive for e-filing | Director | 23 April 2023 | 24 April 2023 | Buy financial reports |
Other individuals who might be associated with Veena Tibrewal are Raghav Tibrewal, Chakresh Tibrewal, Stuti Tibrewal.
FAQ - Veena Tibrewal
-
How many companies is he/she appointed as director?
Veena Tibrewal serves as a director in 2 Companies in India.
-
What is the DIN of Veena Tibrewal?
The DIN of Veena Tibrewal is 07110582.
-
Which is the longest holding directorship of Veena Tibrewal?
The longest directorship of Veena Tibrewal is with STC CONSULTANCY PRIVATE LIMITED.
*Industry classification is inferred. If the company has changed line of business without intimating the Registrar or is a diversified business, classification may be different. We make no warranties about accuracy of industry classification
Tofler, TWS Systems Private Limited and its officers respect the Intellectual Property Rights of all people. Tofler makes no claim of ownership or affiliation with any trademark (REGISTERED OR UNREGISTERED) that forms part of any Company/LLP name listed on this page. Trademarks, if any, listed on this page belong to their respective owners. Read More