VARUN SHARMA
Varun Sharma is registered with the Ministry of Corporate Affairs as a Director in Indian Companies. The DIN (Director Identification Number) of Varun Sharma is 01946696.
Currently, he/she serves as a director in 2 Companies in India. The companies he/she is associated with are from various industries such as Trading etc.
Following are the directorship details of Varun Sharma
NAME | INDUSTRY | INCORP. YEAR | COMP. STATUS | DESIGNATION | DATE OF APPOINTMENT | AS ON | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ECOZENITH ENTERPRISES PRIVATE LIMITED | Trading | 2015 | Active | Director | 27 March 2015 | 6 July 2022 | Buy financial reports |
V K TRADEX PRIVATE LIMITED | Trading | 2008 | Under Process of Striking Off | Director | 20 February 2008 | 13 July 2022 | Buy financial reports |
Other individuals who might be associated with Varun Sharma are Virendra Kumar Sharma.
FAQ - Varun Sharma
-
How many companies is he/she appointed as director?
Varun Sharma serves as a director in 2 Companies in India.
-
What is the DIN of Varun Sharma?
The DIN of Varun Sharma is 01946696.
-
Which is the longest holding directorship of Varun Sharma?
The longest directorship of Varun Sharma is with V K TRADEX PRIVATE LIMITED.
*Industry classification is inferred. If the company has changed line of business without intimating the Registrar or is a diversified business, classification may be different. We make no warranties about accuracy of industry classification
Tofler, TWS Systems Private Limited and its officers respect the Intellectual Property Rights of all people. Tofler makes no claim of ownership or affiliation with any trademark (REGISTERED OR UNREGISTERED) that forms part of any Company/LLP name listed on this page. Trademarks, if any, listed on this page belong to their respective owners. Read More