VARUN KAUSHIK
Varun Kaushik is registered with the Ministry of Corporate Affairs as a Director in Indian Companies. The DIN (Director Identification Number) of Varun Kaushik is 08784901.
Currently, he/she serves as a director in 2 Companies in India. The companies he/she is associated with are from various industries such as Computer Related Services, etc.
Following are the directorship details of Varun Kaushik
NAME | INDUSTRY | INCORP. YEAR | COMP. STATUS | DESIGNATION | DATE OF APPOINTMENT | AS ON | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CAD 2 CAE PRIVATE LIMITED | Computer Related Services | 2020 | Active | Director | 7 July 2020 | 31 August 2022 | Buy financial reports |
RAVIR PRODUCTS LLP | 2023 | Active | Director | 2 May 2023 | 3 May 2023 | Buy financial reports |
Other individuals who might be associated with Varun Kaushik are Raj Kumar Sharma, Babita Sharma.
FAQ - Varun Kaushik
-
How many companies is he/she appointed as director?
Varun Kaushik serves as a director in 2 Companies in India.
-
What is the DIN of Varun Kaushik?
The DIN of Varun Kaushik is 08784901.
-
Which is the longest holding directorship of Varun Kaushik?
The longest directorship of Varun Kaushik is with CAD 2 CAE PRIVATE LIMITED.
*Industry classification is inferred. If the company has changed line of business without intimating the Registrar or is a diversified business, classification may be different. We make no warranties about accuracy of industry classification
Tofler, TWS Systems Private Limited and its officers respect the Intellectual Property Rights of all people. Tofler makes no claim of ownership or affiliation with any trademark (REGISTERED OR UNREGISTERED) that forms part of any Company/LLP name listed on this page. Trademarks, if any, listed on this page belong to their respective owners. Read More