VARUN ASHOK SAXENA
Varun Ashok Saxena is registered with the Ministry of Corporate Affairs as a Director in Indian Companies. The DIN (Director Identification Number) of Varun Ashok Saxena is 07365942.
Currently, he/she serves as a director in 2 Companies in India. The companies he/she is associated with are from various industries such as Trading etc.
Following are the directorship details of Varun Ashok Saxena
NAME | INDUSTRY | INCORP. YEAR | COMP. STATUS | DESIGNATION | DATE OF APPOINTMENT | AS ON | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
INDIGROCER RETAIL SERVICES PRIVATE LIMITED | Trading | 2016 | Active | Director | 4 March 2016 | 28 March 2022 | Buy financial reports |
LAMBEGUS GLOBAL PRIVATE LIMITED | Trading | 2018 | Active | Director | 21 May 2018 | 21 October 2022 | Buy financial reports |
Other individuals who might be associated with Varun Ashok Saxena are Nitin Gangwar, Deepti Saxena.
FAQ - Varun Ashok Saxena
-
How many companies is he/she appointed as director?
Varun Ashok Saxena serves as a director in 2 Companies in India.
-
What is the DIN of Varun Ashok Saxena?
The DIN of Varun Ashok Saxena is 07365942.
-
Which is the longest holding directorship of Varun Ashok Saxena?
The longest directorship of Varun Ashok Saxena is with INDIGROCER RETAIL SERVICES PRIVATE LIMITED.
*Industry classification is inferred. If the company has changed line of business without intimating the Registrar or is a diversified business, classification may be different. We make no warranties about accuracy of industry classification
Tofler, TWS Systems Private Limited and its officers respect the Intellectual Property Rights of all people. Tofler makes no claim of ownership or affiliation with any trademark (REGISTERED OR UNREGISTERED) that forms part of any Company/LLP name listed on this page. Trademarks, if any, listed on this page belong to their respective owners. Read More