VANDITA KRISHNAN IYER
Vandita Krishnan Iyer is registered with the Ministry of Corporate Affairs as a Director in Indian Companies. The DIN (Director Identification Number) of Vandita Krishnan Iyer is 00846615.
Currently, he/she serves as a director in 2 Companies in India. The companies he/she is associated with are from various industries such as Trading etc.
Following are the directorship details of Vandita Krishnan Iyer
NAME | INDUSTRY | INCORP. YEAR | COMP. STATUS | DESIGNATION | DATE OF APPOINTMENT | AS ON | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
FAIRDEAL MERCANTILE (BOMBAY) PVT LTD | Trading | 1986 | Active | Director | 22 June 1989 | 7 September 2022 | Buy financial reports |
MANISH SALES PRIVATE LIMITED | Trading | 1989 | Active | Director | 20 November 2015 | 26 December 2022 | Buy financial reports |
Other individuals who might be associated with Vandita Krishnan Iyer are Laxmi Krishnan, Rajesh Krishnan Iyer.
FAQ - Vandita Krishnan Iyer
-
How many companies is he/she appointed as director?
Vandita Krishnan Iyer serves as a director in 2 Companies in India.
-
What is the DIN of Vandita Krishnan Iyer?
The DIN of Vandita Krishnan Iyer is 00846615.
-
Which is the longest holding directorship of Vandita Krishnan Iyer?
The longest directorship of Vandita Krishnan Iyer is with FAIRDEAL MERCANTILE (BOMBAY) PVT LTD.
*Industry classification is inferred. If the company has changed line of business without intimating the Registrar or is a diversified business, classification may be different. We make no warranties about accuracy of industry classification
Tofler, TWS Systems Private Limited and its officers respect the Intellectual Property Rights of all people. Tofler makes no claim of ownership or affiliation with any trademark (REGISTERED OR UNREGISTERED) that forms part of any Company/LLP name listed on this page. Trademarks, if any, listed on this page belong to their respective owners. Read More