VANDANA PANDEY
Vandana Pandey is registered with the Ministry of Corporate Affairs as a Director in Indian Companies. The DIN (Director Identification Number) of Vandana Pandey is 09178215.
Currently, he/she serves as a director in 2 Companies in India. The companies he/she is associated with are from various industries such as Finance etc.
Following are the directorship details of Vandana Pandey
NAME | INDUSTRY | INCORP. YEAR | COMP. STATUS | DESIGNATION | DATE OF APPOINTMENT | AS ON | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GRAMIN UDAY NIDHI LIMITED | Finance | 2018 | Active | Director | 9 April 2018 | 4 September 2022 | Buy financial reports |
GRAM UTTPRERAK NIDHI LIMITED | Finance | 2021 | Active | Director | 19 May 2021 | 8 October 2022 | Buy financial reports |
Other individuals who might be associated with Vandana Pandey are Anil Kumar Pandey, Pappu Pandey, Ritesh, Satyajeet Ranjan.
FAQ - Vandana Pandey
-
How many companies is he/she appointed as director?
Vandana Pandey serves as a director in 2 Companies in India.
-
What is the DIN of Vandana Pandey?
The DIN of Vandana Pandey is 09178215.
-
Which is the longest holding directorship of Vandana Pandey?
The longest directorship of Vandana Pandey is with GRAMIN UDAY NIDHI LIMITED.
*Industry classification is inferred. If the company has changed line of business without intimating the Registrar or is a diversified business, classification may be different. We make no warranties about accuracy of industry classification
Tofler, TWS Systems Private Limited and its officers respect the Intellectual Property Rights of all people. Tofler makes no claim of ownership or affiliation with any trademark (REGISTERED OR UNREGISTERED) that forms part of any Company/LLP name listed on this page. Trademarks, if any, listed on this page belong to their respective owners. Read More