VAIBHAVA DUGAR
Vaibhava Dugar is registered with the Ministry of Corporate Affairs as a Director in Indian Companies. The DIN (Director Identification Number) of Vaibhava Dugar is 00900524.
Currently, he/she serves as a director in 2 Companies in India. The companies he/she is associated with are from various industries such as Trading etc.
Following are the directorship details of Vaibhava Dugar
NAME | INDUSTRY | INCORP. YEAR | COMP. STATUS | DESIGNATION | DATE OF APPOINTMENT | AS ON | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ZILLION MERCANTILES PVT. LTD. | Trading | 1995 | Active | Director | 1 September 2011 | 6 April 2024 | Buy financial reports |
CS RETAIL PRIVATE LIMITED | Trading | 2007 | Active | Director | 17 May 2007 | 22 August 2024 | Buy financial reports |
Other individuals who might be associated with Vaibhava Dugar are Dinesh Kumar Dugar, Vijay Dugar.
FAQ - Vaibhava Dugar
-
How many companies is he/she appointed as director?
Vaibhava Dugar serves as a director in 2 Companies in India.
-
What is the DIN of Vaibhava Dugar?
The DIN of Vaibhava Dugar is 00900524.
-
Which is the longest holding directorship of Vaibhava Dugar?
The longest directorship of Vaibhava Dugar is with CS RETAIL PRIVATE LIMITED.
*Industry classification is inferred. If the company has changed line of business without intimating the Registrar or is a diversified business, classification may be different. We make no warranties about accuracy of industry classification
Tofler, TWS Systems Private Limited and its officers respect the Intellectual Property Rights of all people. Tofler makes no claim of ownership or affiliation with any trademark (REGISTERED OR UNREGISTERED) that forms part of any Company/LLP name listed on this page. Trademarks, if any, listed on this page belong to their respective owners. Read More