UZMA FATIMA
Uzma Fatima is registered with the Ministry of Corporate Affairs as a Director in Indian Companies. The DIN (Director Identification Number) of Uzma Fatima is 08122621.
Currently, he/she serves as a director in 2 Companies in India. The companies he/she is associated with are from various industries such as Business Services etc.
Following are the directorship details of Uzma Fatima
NAME | INDUSTRY | INCORP. YEAR | COMP. STATUS | DESIGNATION | DATE OF APPOINTMENT | AS ON | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PANGAEA ACADEMIC COMMUNICATIONS PRIVATE LIMITED | Business Services | 2022 | Active | Director | 7 June 2022 | 17 January 2023 | Buy financial reports |
RECDESPROT PRIVATE LIMITED | Business Services | 2018 | Active | Director | 2 May 2018 | 12 February 2023 | Buy financial reports |
Other individuals who might be associated with Uzma Fatima are Neeraj Dhaunta, Sabiha Khatoon.
FAQ - Uzma Fatima
-
How many companies is he/she appointed as director?
Uzma Fatima serves as a director in 2 Companies in India.
-
What is the DIN of Uzma Fatima?
The DIN of Uzma Fatima is 08122621.
-
Which is the longest holding directorship of Uzma Fatima?
The longest directorship of Uzma Fatima is with RECDESPROT PRIVATE LIMITED.
*Industry classification is inferred. If the company has changed line of business without intimating the Registrar or is a diversified business, classification may be different. We make no warranties about accuracy of industry classification
Tofler, TWS Systems Private Limited and its officers respect the Intellectual Property Rights of all people. Tofler makes no claim of ownership or affiliation with any trademark (REGISTERED OR UNREGISTERED) that forms part of any Company/LLP name listed on this page. Trademarks, if any, listed on this page belong to their respective owners. Read More