UTTAM LODHA
Uttam Lodha is registered with the Ministry of Corporate Affairs as a Director in Indian Companies. The DIN (Director Identification Number) of Uttam Lodha is 05110311.
Currently, he/she serves as a director in 2 Companies in India. The companies he/she is associated with are from various industries such as Trading etc.
Following are the directorship details of Uttam Lodha
NAME | INDUSTRY | INCORP. YEAR | COMP. STATUS | DESIGNATION | DATE OF APPOINTMENT | AS ON | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LUCAS POWER SOLUTIONS PRIVATE LIMITED | Trading | 2011 | Active | Director | 8 November 2011 | 13 February 2023 | Buy financial reports |
ULS FOODS PRIVATE LIMITED | Trading | 2018 | Active | Director | 8 June 2018 | 5 April 2023 | Buy financial reports |
Other individuals who might be associated with Uttam Lodha are Arpita Lodha, Sandeep Kumar Prajapati.
FAQ - Uttam Lodha
-
How many companies is he/she appointed as director?
Uttam Lodha serves as a director in 2 Companies in India.
-
What is the DIN of Uttam Lodha?
The DIN of Uttam Lodha is 05110311.
-
Which is the longest holding directorship of Uttam Lodha?
The longest directorship of Uttam Lodha is with LUCAS POWER SOLUTIONS PRIVATE LIMITED.
*Industry classification is inferred. If the company has changed line of business without intimating the Registrar or is a diversified business, classification may be different. We make no warranties about accuracy of industry classification
Tofler, TWS Systems Private Limited and its officers respect the Intellectual Property Rights of all people. Tofler makes no claim of ownership or affiliation with any trademark (REGISTERED OR UNREGISTERED) that forms part of any Company/LLP name listed on this page. Trademarks, if any, listed on this page belong to their respective owners. Read More