USHA CHAND
Usha Chand is registered with the Ministry of Corporate Affairs as a Director in Indian Companies. The DIN (Director Identification Number) of Usha Chand is 07170916.
Currently, he/she serves as a director in 2 Companies in India. The companies he/she is associated with are from various industries such as Trading, Other Business Activities etc.
Following are the directorship details of Usha Chand
NAME | INDUSTRY | INCORP. YEAR | COMP. STATUS | DESIGNATION | DATE OF APPOINTMENT | AS ON | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KAMYABI VYAPAAR PVT LTD | Trading | 2006 | Active | Director | 6 May 2015 | 12 November 2022 | Buy financial reports |
AVINASH VANIJYA LLP | Other Business Activities | 2019 | Active | Director | 30 July 2019 | 22 August 2024 | Buy financial reports |
Other individuals who might be associated with Usha Chand are Sangeeta Poddar.
FAQ - Usha Chand
-
How many companies is he/she appointed as director?
Usha Chand serves as a director in 2 Companies in India.
-
What is the DIN of Usha Chand?
The DIN of Usha Chand is 07170916.
-
Which is the longest holding directorship of Usha Chand?
The longest directorship of Usha Chand is with KAMYABI VYAPAAR PVT LTD.
*Industry classification is inferred. If the company has changed line of business without intimating the Registrar or is a diversified business, classification may be different. We make no warranties about accuracy of industry classification
Tofler, TWS Systems Private Limited and its officers respect the Intellectual Property Rights of all people. Tofler makes no claim of ownership or affiliation with any trademark (REGISTERED OR UNREGISTERED) that forms part of any Company/LLP name listed on this page. Trademarks, if any, listed on this page belong to their respective owners. Read More