UMA VENKATRAM
Uma Venkatram is registered with the Ministry of Corporate Affairs as a Director in Indian Companies. The DIN (Director Identification Number) of Uma Venkatram is 05173443.
Currently, he/she serves as a director in 2 Companies in India. The companies he/she is associated with are from various industries such as Business Services, etc.
Following are the directorship details of Uma Venkatram
NAME | INDUSTRY | INCORP. YEAR | COMP. STATUS | DESIGNATION | DATE OF APPOINTMENT | AS ON | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
EESAN CONSULTANCY PRIVATE LIMITED | Business Services | 2012 | Converted to LLP | Director | 6 February 2012 | 16 February 2022 | Buy financial reports |
EESAN ASSOCIATES LLP | 2016 | Active | Director | 2 May 2016 | 19 April 2024 | Buy financial reports |
Other individuals who might be associated with Uma Venkatram are Venkatraman Anand Natraj, Ayyar Venkatesh Divya.
FAQ - Uma Venkatram
-
How many companies is he/she appointed as director?
Uma Venkatram serves as a director in 2 Companies in India.
-
What is the DIN of Uma Venkatram?
The DIN of Uma Venkatram is 05173443.
-
Which is the longest holding directorship of Uma Venkatram?
The longest directorship of Uma Venkatram is with EESAN CONSULTANCY PRIVATE LIMITED.
*Industry classification is inferred. If the company has changed line of business without intimating the Registrar or is a diversified business, classification may be different. We make no warranties about accuracy of industry classification
Tofler, TWS Systems Private Limited and its officers respect the Intellectual Property Rights of all people. Tofler makes no claim of ownership or affiliation with any trademark (REGISTERED OR UNREGISTERED) that forms part of any Company/LLP name listed on this page. Trademarks, if any, listed on this page belong to their respective owners. Read More