ULAGESWARAN
Ulageswaran is registered with the Ministry of Corporate Affairs as a Director in Indian Companies. The DIN (Director Identification Number) of Ulageswaran is 08772792.
Currently, he/she serves as a director in 2 Companies in India. The companies he/she is associated with are from various industries such as Education, Trading etc.
Following are the directorship details of Ulageswaran
NAME | INDUSTRY | INCORP. YEAR | COMP. STATUS | DESIGNATION | DATE OF APPOINTMENT | AS ON | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ALEIO GLOBAL PAY PRIVATE LIMITED | Education | 2020 | Active | Director | 18 December 2020 | 13 December 2022 | Buy financial reports |
TX ICM CLUB PRIVATE LIMITED | Trading | 2020 | Active | Director | 26 June 2020 | 3 April 2023 | Buy financial reports |
Other individuals who might be associated with Ulageswaran are Sylvester Celastin Raj.
FAQ - Ulageswaran
-
How many companies is he/she appointed as director?
Ulageswaran serves as a director in 2 Companies in India.
-
What is the DIN of Ulageswaran?
The DIN of Ulageswaran is 08772792.
-
Which is the longest holding directorship of Ulageswaran?
The longest directorship of Ulageswaran is with TX ICM CLUB PRIVATE LIMITED.
*Industry classification is inferred. If the company has changed line of business without intimating the Registrar or is a diversified business, classification may be different. We make no warranties about accuracy of industry classification
Tofler, TWS Systems Private Limited and its officers respect the Intellectual Property Rights of all people. Tofler makes no claim of ownership or affiliation with any trademark (REGISTERED OR UNREGISTERED) that forms part of any Company/LLP name listed on this page. Trademarks, if any, listed on this page belong to their respective owners. Read More