UDIT SHARMA
Udit Sharma is registered with the Ministry of Corporate Affairs as a Director in Indian Companies. The DIN (Director Identification Number) of Udit Sharma is 09217916.
Currently, he/she serves as a director in 2 Companies in India. The companies he/she is associated with are from various industries such as Construction, Unknown etc.
Following are the directorship details of Udit Sharma
NAME | INDUSTRY | INCORP. YEAR | COMP. STATUS | DESIGNATION | DATE OF APPOINTMENT | AS ON | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LUBH INFRA PRIVATE LIMITED | Construction | 2021 | Active | Director | 14 July 2021 | 3 December 2022 | Buy financial reports |
LUBH TECHIE PRIVATE LIMITED | Unknown | 2023 | Not available for efiling | Director | 26 June 2023 | 27 June 2023 | Buy financial reports |
Other individuals who might be associated with Udit Sharma are Gaurav Dagar, Har Kishor.
FAQ - Udit Sharma
-
How many companies is he/she appointed as director?
Udit Sharma serves as a director in 2 Companies in India.
-
What is the DIN of Udit Sharma?
The DIN of Udit Sharma is 09217916.
-
Which is the longest holding directorship of Udit Sharma?
The longest directorship of Udit Sharma is with LUBH INFRA PRIVATE LIMITED.
*Industry classification is inferred. If the company has changed line of business without intimating the Registrar or is a diversified business, classification may be different. We make no warranties about accuracy of industry classification
Tofler, TWS Systems Private Limited and its officers respect the Intellectual Property Rights of all people. Tofler makes no claim of ownership or affiliation with any trademark (REGISTERED OR UNREGISTERED) that forms part of any Company/LLP name listed on this page. Trademarks, if any, listed on this page belong to their respective owners. Read More