TARSEM KUMAR
Tarsem Kumar is registered with the Ministry of Corporate Affairs as a Director in Indian Companies. The DIN (Director Identification Number) of Tarsem Kumar is 00286750.
Currently, he/she serves as a director in 2 Companies in India. The companies he/she is associated with are from various industries such as Business Services, Construction etc.
Following are the directorship details of Tarsem Kumar
NAME | INDUSTRY | INCORP. YEAR | COMP. STATUS | DESIGNATION | DATE OF APPOINTMENT | AS ON | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
OPTRA REALTORS PRIVATE LIMITED | Business Services | 2008 | Active | Director | 1 February 2008 | 20 July 2022 | Buy financial reports |
MONGA SUPER BUILD TECH PRIVATE LIMITED | Construction | 2005 | Active | Director | 30 May 2005 | 19 April 2023 | Buy financial reports |
Other individuals who might be associated with Tarsem Kumar are Raj Rani.
FAQ - Tarsem Kumar
-
How many companies is he/she appointed as director?
Tarsem Kumar serves as a director in 2 Companies in India.
-
What is the DIN of Tarsem Kumar?
The DIN of Tarsem Kumar is 00286750.
-
Which is the longest holding directorship of Tarsem Kumar?
The longest directorship of Tarsem Kumar is with MONGA SUPER BUILD TECH PRIVATE LIMITED.
*Industry classification is inferred. If the company has changed line of business without intimating the Registrar or is a diversified business, classification may be different. We make no warranties about accuracy of industry classification
Tofler, TWS Systems Private Limited and its officers respect the Intellectual Property Rights of all people. Tofler makes no claim of ownership or affiliation with any trademark (REGISTERED OR UNREGISTERED) that forms part of any Company/LLP name listed on this page. Trademarks, if any, listed on this page belong to their respective owners. Read More