TANVI JOSHI
Tanvi Joshi is registered with the Ministry of Corporate Affairs as a Director in Indian Companies. The DIN (Director Identification Number) of Tanvi Joshi is 09368948.
Currently, he/she serves as a director in 2 Companies in India. The companies he/she is associated with are from various industries such as Hotels and Restaurants, etc.
Following are the directorship details of Tanvi Joshi
NAME | INDUSTRY | INCORP. YEAR | COMP. STATUS | DESIGNATION | DATE OF APPOINTMENT | AS ON | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SOULFULLY HUNGRY (OPC) PRIVATE LIMITED | Hotels and Restaurants | 2021 | Active | Director | 22 October 2021 | 13 March 2023 | Buy financial reports |
VENERES HOSPITALITY LLP | 2023 | Active | Director | 5 September 2023 | 6 September 2023 | Buy financial reports |
Other individuals who might be associated with Tanvi Joshi are Aniket Bhaskar Atram.
FAQ - Tanvi Joshi
-
How many companies is he/she appointed as director?
Tanvi Joshi serves as a director in 2 Companies in India.
-
What is the DIN of Tanvi Joshi?
The DIN of Tanvi Joshi is 09368948.
-
Which is the longest holding directorship of Tanvi Joshi?
The longest directorship of Tanvi Joshi is with SOULFULLY HUNGRY (OPC) PRIVATE LIMITED.
*Industry classification is inferred. If the company has changed line of business without intimating the Registrar or is a diversified business, classification may be different. We make no warranties about accuracy of industry classification
Tofler, TWS Systems Private Limited and its officers respect the Intellectual Property Rights of all people. Tofler makes no claim of ownership or affiliation with any trademark (REGISTERED OR UNREGISTERED) that forms part of any Company/LLP name listed on this page. Trademarks, if any, listed on this page belong to their respective owners. Read More