SWATI
Swati is registered with the Ministry of Corporate Affairs as a Director in Indian Companies. The DIN (Director Identification Number) of Swati is 08509530.
Currently, he/she serves as a director in 2 Companies in India. The companies he/she is associated with are from various industries such as Health and Social Work, Trading etc.
Following are the directorship details of Swati
NAME | INDUSTRY | INCORP. YEAR | COMP. STATUS | DESIGNATION | DATE OF APPOINTMENT | AS ON | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SANYUKT PRAYAS FOUNDATION | Health and Social Work | 2021 | Active | Director | 28 July 2021 | 3 February 2023 | Buy financial reports |
SWADESHI AYURVED PRIVATE LIMITED | Trading | 2008 | Active | Director | 17 July 2019 | 28 April 2023 | Buy financial reports |
Other individuals who might be associated with Swati are Pulkit Arya, Sunita Arya.
FAQ - Swati
-
How many companies is he/she appointed as director?
Swati serves as a director in 2 Companies in India.
-
What is the DIN of Swati?
The DIN of Swati is 08509530.
-
Which is the longest holding directorship of Swati?
The longest directorship of Swati is with SWADESHI AYURVED PRIVATE LIMITED.
*Industry classification is inferred. If the company has changed line of business without intimating the Registrar or is a diversified business, classification may be different. We make no warranties about accuracy of industry classification
Tofler, TWS Systems Private Limited and its officers respect the Intellectual Property Rights of all people. Tofler makes no claim of ownership or affiliation with any trademark (REGISTERED OR UNREGISTERED) that forms part of any Company/LLP name listed on this page. Trademarks, if any, listed on this page belong to their respective owners. Read More