SWATI VIJAY
Swati Vijay is registered with the Ministry of Corporate Affairs as a Director in Indian Companies. The DIN (Director Identification Number) of Swati Vijay is 08521084.
Currently, he/she serves as a director in 2 Companies in India. The companies he/she is associated with are from various industries such as Trading, Unknown etc.
Following are the directorship details of Swati Vijay
NAME | INDUSTRY | INCORP. YEAR | COMP. STATUS | DESIGNATION | DATE OF APPOINTMENT | AS ON | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ARSIGA SOLAR PRIVATE LIMITED | Trading | 2019 | Active | Director | 26 July 2019 | 20 April 2023 | Buy financial reports |
KARTWARE PRIVATE LIMITED | Unknown | 2023 | Active | Director | 19 April 2023 | 26 April 2023 | Buy financial reports |
Other individuals who might be associated with Swati Vijay are Anuradha Kumari, Anuranjan Shukla, Neelam.
FAQ - Swati Vijay
-
How many companies is he/she appointed as director?
Swati Vijay serves as a director in 2 Companies in India.
-
What is the DIN of Swati Vijay?
The DIN of Swati Vijay is 08521084.
-
Which is the longest holding directorship of Swati Vijay?
The longest directorship of Swati Vijay is with ARSIGA SOLAR PRIVATE LIMITED.
*Industry classification is inferred. If the company has changed line of business without intimating the Registrar or is a diversified business, classification may be different. We make no warranties about accuracy of industry classification
Tofler, TWS Systems Private Limited and its officers respect the Intellectual Property Rights of all people. Tofler makes no claim of ownership or affiliation with any trademark (REGISTERED OR UNREGISTERED) that forms part of any Company/LLP name listed on this page. Trademarks, if any, listed on this page belong to their respective owners. Read More