SWARNA SAHA
Swarna Saha is registered with the Ministry of Corporate Affairs as a Director in Indian Companies. The DIN (Director Identification Number) of Swarna Saha is 03461636.
Currently, he/she serves as a director in 2 Companies in India. The companies he/she is associated with are from various industries such as Trading, Business Services etc.
Following are the directorship details of Swarna Saha
NAME | INDUSTRY | INCORP. YEAR | COMP. STATUS | DESIGNATION | DATE OF APPOINTMENT | AS ON | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CALCUTTA TAVERN PRIVATE LIMITED | Trading | 2022 | Not available for efiling | Director | 26 August 2022 | 27 August 2022 | Buy financial reports |
TERMINAL WINE PRIVATE LIMITED | Business Services | 2018 | Active | Director | 24 July 2021 | 8 August 2023 | Buy financial reports |
Other individuals who might be associated with Swarna Saha are Soumitra Saha, Rupa Saha.
FAQ - Swarna Saha
-
How many companies is he/she appointed as director?
Swarna Saha serves as a director in 2 Companies in India.
-
What is the DIN of Swarna Saha?
The DIN of Swarna Saha is 03461636.
-
Which is the longest holding directorship of Swarna Saha?
The longest directorship of Swarna Saha is with TERMINAL WINE PRIVATE LIMITED.
*Industry classification is inferred. If the company has changed line of business without intimating the Registrar or is a diversified business, classification may be different. We make no warranties about accuracy of industry classification
Tofler, TWS Systems Private Limited and its officers respect the Intellectual Property Rights of all people. Tofler makes no claim of ownership or affiliation with any trademark (REGISTERED OR UNREGISTERED) that forms part of any Company/LLP name listed on this page. Trademarks, if any, listed on this page belong to their respective owners. Read More