SUUMEET KOTHARI
Suumeet Kothari is registered with the Ministry of Corporate Affairs as a Director in Indian Companies. The DIN (Director Identification Number) of Suumeet Kothari is 08654197.
Currently, he/she serves as a director in 2 Companies in India. The companies he/she is associated with are from various industries such as Trading, etc.
Following are the directorship details of Suumeet Kothari
NAME | INDUSTRY | INCORP. YEAR | COMP. STATUS | DESIGNATION | DATE OF APPOINTMENT | AS ON | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GLORIA GEMS TRADING PRIVATE LIMITED | Trading | 2010 | Active | Director | 8 January 2020 | 9 January 2023 | Buy financial reports |
KGK GEMSTONES LLP | 2022 | Active | Director | 19 July 2022 | 22 August 2024 | Buy financial reports |
Other individuals who might be associated with Suumeet Kothari are Manish Tulsyan, Manak Chand Mehta.
FAQ - Suumeet Kothari
-
How many companies is he/she appointed as director?
Suumeet Kothari serves as a director in 2 Companies in India.
-
What is the DIN of Suumeet Kothari?
The DIN of Suumeet Kothari is 08654197.
-
Which is the longest holding directorship of Suumeet Kothari?
The longest directorship of Suumeet Kothari is with GLORIA GEMS TRADING PRIVATE LIMITED.
*Industry classification is inferred. If the company has changed line of business without intimating the Registrar or is a diversified business, classification may be different. We make no warranties about accuracy of industry classification
Tofler, TWS Systems Private Limited and its officers respect the Intellectual Property Rights of all people. Tofler makes no claim of ownership or affiliation with any trademark (REGISTERED OR UNREGISTERED) that forms part of any Company/LLP name listed on this page. Trademarks, if any, listed on this page belong to their respective owners. Read More