SUPRIYA SWEETI
Supriya Sweeti is registered with the Ministry of Corporate Affairs as a Director in Indian Companies. The DIN (Director Identification Number) of Supriya Sweeti is 08764469.
Currently, he/she serves as a director in 2 Companies in India. The companies he/she is associated with are from various industries such as Trading etc.
Following are the directorship details of Supriya Sweeti
NAME | INDUSTRY | INCORP. YEAR | COMP. STATUS | DESIGNATION | DATE OF APPOINTMENT | AS ON | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SHRIOM OMMART (OPC) PRIVATE LIMITED | Trading | 2021 | Active | Director | 20 July 2021 | 21 October 2022 | Buy financial reports |
SHRIOMMART PRIVATE LIMITED | Trading | 2020 | Active | Director | 16 June 2020 | 19 May 2024 | Buy financial reports |
Other individuals who might be associated with Supriya Sweeti are Aniket Kumar.
FAQ - Supriya Sweeti
-
How many companies is he/she appointed as director?
Supriya Sweeti serves as a director in 2 Companies in India.
-
What is the DIN of Supriya Sweeti?
The DIN of Supriya Sweeti is 08764469.
-
Which is the longest holding directorship of Supriya Sweeti?
The longest directorship of Supriya Sweeti is with SHRIOMMART PRIVATE LIMITED.
*Industry classification is inferred. If the company has changed line of business without intimating the Registrar or is a diversified business, classification may be different. We make no warranties about accuracy of industry classification
Tofler, TWS Systems Private Limited and its officers respect the Intellectual Property Rights of all people. Tofler makes no claim of ownership or affiliation with any trademark (REGISTERED OR UNREGISTERED) that forms part of any Company/LLP name listed on this page. Trademarks, if any, listed on this page belong to their respective owners. Read More