SUNITA GARG
Sunita Garg is registered with the Ministry of Corporate Affairs as a Director in Indian Companies. The DIN (Director Identification Number) of Sunita Garg is 02044989.
Currently, he/she serves as a director in 2 Companies in India. The companies he/she is associated with are from various industries such as Finance, Trading etc.
Following are the directorship details of Sunita Garg
NAME | INDUSTRY | INCORP. YEAR | COMP. STATUS | DESIGNATION | DATE OF APPOINTMENT | AS ON | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
AANVEE SECURITIES PRIVATE LIMITED | Finance | 2009 | Active | Director | 11 September 2009 | 17 February 2022 | Buy financial reports |
VHQ IMPEX PRIVATE LIMITED | Trading | 2003 | Active | Director | 27 April 2009 | 1 May 2023 | Buy financial reports |
Other individuals who might be associated with Sunita Garg are Sapan Mohan Garg, Sangeeta Singhal.
FAQ - Sunita Garg
-
How many companies is he/she appointed as director?
Sunita Garg serves as a director in 2 Companies in India.
-
What is the DIN of Sunita Garg?
The DIN of Sunita Garg is 02044989.
-
Which is the longest holding directorship of Sunita Garg?
The longest directorship of Sunita Garg is with VHQ IMPEX PRIVATE LIMITED.
*Industry classification is inferred. If the company has changed line of business without intimating the Registrar or is a diversified business, classification may be different. We make no warranties about accuracy of industry classification
Tofler, TWS Systems Private Limited and its officers respect the Intellectual Property Rights of all people. Tofler makes no claim of ownership or affiliation with any trademark (REGISTERED OR UNREGISTERED) that forms part of any Company/LLP name listed on this page. Trademarks, if any, listed on this page belong to their respective owners. Read More