SUNITA DIXIT
Sunita Dixit is registered with the Ministry of Corporate Affairs as a Director in Indian Companies. The DIN (Director Identification Number) of Sunita Dixit is 07024291.
Currently, he/she serves as a director in 2 Companies in India. The companies he/she is associated with are from various industries such as Trading, Business Services etc.
Following are the directorship details of Sunita Dixit
NAME | INDUSTRY | INCORP. YEAR | COMP. STATUS | DESIGNATION | DATE OF APPOINTMENT | AS ON | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MEDIEX HEALTHCARE PRIVATE LIMITED | Trading | 2011 | Active | Director | 27 October 2014 | 25 June 2022 | Buy financial reports |
BRAJ DHARA NUTRITION INDIA PRIVATE LIMITED | Business Services | 2017 | Active | Director | 3 October 2017 | 28 July 2022 | Buy financial reports |
Other individuals who might be associated with Sunita Dixit are Amit Dixit.
FAQ - Sunita Dixit
-
How many companies is he/she appointed as director?
Sunita Dixit serves as a director in 2 Companies in India.
-
What is the DIN of Sunita Dixit?
The DIN of Sunita Dixit is 07024291.
-
Which is the longest holding directorship of Sunita Dixit?
The longest directorship of Sunita Dixit is with MEDIEX HEALTHCARE PRIVATE LIMITED.
*Industry classification is inferred. If the company has changed line of business without intimating the Registrar or is a diversified business, classification may be different. We make no warranties about accuracy of industry classification
Tofler, TWS Systems Private Limited and its officers respect the Intellectual Property Rights of all people. Tofler makes no claim of ownership or affiliation with any trademark (REGISTERED OR UNREGISTERED) that forms part of any Company/LLP name listed on this page. Trademarks, if any, listed on this page belong to their respective owners. Read More