SUNIL KUMAR SINGH
Sunil Kumar Singh is registered with the Ministry of Corporate Affairs as a Director in Indian Companies. The DIN (Director Identification Number) of Sunil Kumar Singh is 01887643.
Currently, he/she serves as a director in 2 Companies in India. The companies he/she is associated with are from various industries such as Trading etc.
Following are the directorship details of Sunil Kumar Singh
NAME | INDUSTRY | INCORP. YEAR | COMP. STATUS | DESIGNATION | DATE OF APPOINTMENT | AS ON | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CREATIVE BIO-LIFESCIENCE PRIVATE LIMTED | Trading | 2007 | Active | Director | 22 May 2007 | 16 March 2022 | Buy financial reports |
CREATIVE LIFE CARE PRIVATE LIMITED | Trading | 2004 | Active | Director | 1 November 2013 | 6 July 2022 | Buy financial reports |
Other individuals who might be associated with Sunil Kumar Singh are Ranjana Singh, Soni Singh.
FAQ - Sunil Kumar Singh
-
How many companies is he/she appointed as director?
Sunil Kumar Singh serves as a director in 2 Companies in India.
-
What is the DIN of Sunil Kumar Singh?
The DIN of Sunil Kumar Singh is 01887643.
-
Which is the longest holding directorship of Sunil Kumar Singh?
The longest directorship of Sunil Kumar Singh is with CREATIVE BIO-LIFESCIENCE PRIVATE LIMTED.
*Industry classification is inferred. If the company has changed line of business without intimating the Registrar or is a diversified business, classification may be different. We make no warranties about accuracy of industry classification
Tofler, TWS Systems Private Limited and its officers respect the Intellectual Property Rights of all people. Tofler makes no claim of ownership or affiliation with any trademark (REGISTERED OR UNREGISTERED) that forms part of any Company/LLP name listed on this page. Trademarks, if any, listed on this page belong to their respective owners. Read More