SUNDEEP MALHAN .
Sundeep Malhan . is registered with the Ministry of Corporate Affairs as a Director in Indian Companies. The DIN (Director Identification Number) of Sundeep Malhan . is 05252711.
Currently, he/she serves as a director in 2 Companies in India. The companies he/she is associated with are from various industries such as Construction, Trading etc.
Following are the directorship details of Sundeep Malhan .
NAME | INDUSTRY | INCORP. YEAR | COMP. STATUS | DESIGNATION | DATE OF APPOINTMENT | AS ON | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
FACADE CLAD TECH LLP | Construction | 2019 | Active | Director | 16 July 2019 | 17 July 2019 | Buy financial reports |
ECIE IMPACT PRIVATE LIMITED | Trading | 1960 | Active | Director | 15 May 2023 | 23 August 2024 | Buy financial reports |
Other individuals who might be associated with Sundeep Malhan . are Shruti Kapur, Tanvir Singh.
FAQ - Sundeep Malhan .
-
How many companies is he/she appointed as director?
Sundeep Malhan . serves as a director in 2 Companies in India.
-
What is the DIN of Sundeep Malhan .?
The DIN of Sundeep Malhan . is 05252711.
-
Which is the longest holding directorship of Sundeep Malhan .?
The longest directorship of Sundeep Malhan . is with FACADE CLAD TECH LLP.
*Industry classification is inferred. If the company has changed line of business without intimating the Registrar or is a diversified business, classification may be different. We make no warranties about accuracy of industry classification
Tofler, TWS Systems Private Limited and its officers respect the Intellectual Property Rights of all people. Tofler makes no claim of ownership or affiliation with any trademark (REGISTERED OR UNREGISTERED) that forms part of any Company/LLP name listed on this page. Trademarks, if any, listed on this page belong to their respective owners. Read More