SUMIT NILAM
Sumit Nilam is registered with the Ministry of Corporate Affairs as a Director in Indian Companies. The DIN (Director Identification Number) of Sumit Nilam is 08155499.
Currently, he/she serves as a director in 2 Companies in India. The companies he/she is associated with are from various industries such as Business Services etc.
Following are the directorship details of Sumit Nilam
NAME | INDUSTRY | INCORP. YEAR | COMP. STATUS | DESIGNATION | DATE OF APPOINTMENT | AS ON | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NEELAM SECURITY SERVICE (OPC) PRIVATE LIMITED | Business Services | 2018 | Active | Director | 12 June 2018 | 15 February 2022 | Buy financial reports |
SECURETIGER SECURITY SERVICE PRIVATE LIMITED | Business Services | 2020 | Active | Director | 25 November 2020 | 4 March 2022 | Buy financial reports |
Other individuals who might be associated with Sumit Nilam are Amit Singh.
FAQ - Sumit Nilam
-
How many companies is he/she appointed as director?
Sumit Nilam serves as a director in 2 Companies in India.
-
What is the DIN of Sumit Nilam?
The DIN of Sumit Nilam is 08155499.
-
Which is the longest holding directorship of Sumit Nilam?
The longest directorship of Sumit Nilam is with NEELAM SECURITY SERVICE (OPC) PRIVATE LIMITED.
*Industry classification is inferred. If the company has changed line of business without intimating the Registrar or is a diversified business, classification may be different. We make no warranties about accuracy of industry classification
Tofler, TWS Systems Private Limited and its officers respect the Intellectual Property Rights of all people. Tofler makes no claim of ownership or affiliation with any trademark (REGISTERED OR UNREGISTERED) that forms part of any Company/LLP name listed on this page. Trademarks, if any, listed on this page belong to their respective owners. Read More