SUBBA RAJU NADIMPALLI
Subba Raju Nadimpalli is registered with the Ministry of Corporate Affairs as a Director in Indian Companies. The DIN (Director Identification Number) of Subba Raju Nadimpalli is 10021527.
Currently, he/she serves as a director in 2 Companies in India. The companies he/she is associated with are from various industries such as etc.
Following are the directorship details of Subba Raju Nadimpalli
NAME | INDUSTRY | INCORP. YEAR | COMP. STATUS | DESIGNATION | DATE OF APPOINTMENT | AS ON | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MEDHINI FARM LANDS LLP | 2022 | Active | Director | 27 September 2022 | 11 October 2022 | Buy financial reports | |
Tattva Residence LLP | 2023 | Inactive for e-filing | Director | 9 January 2023 | 10 January 2023 | Buy financial reports |
Other individuals who might be associated with Subba Raju Nadimpalli are Rakesh Ranjan, Satyanarayana Gunda, Vithal Govind Punnam.
FAQ - Subba Raju Nadimpalli
-
How many companies is he/she appointed as director?
Subba Raju Nadimpalli serves as a director in 2 Companies in India.
-
What is the DIN of Subba Raju Nadimpalli?
The DIN of Subba Raju Nadimpalli is 10021527.
-
Which is the longest holding directorship of Subba Raju Nadimpalli?
The longest directorship of Subba Raju Nadimpalli is with MEDHINI FARM LANDS LLP.
*Industry classification is inferred. If the company has changed line of business without intimating the Registrar or is a diversified business, classification may be different. We make no warranties about accuracy of industry classification
Tofler, TWS Systems Private Limited and its officers respect the Intellectual Property Rights of all people. Tofler makes no claim of ownership or affiliation with any trademark (REGISTERED OR UNREGISTERED) that forms part of any Company/LLP name listed on this page. Trademarks, if any, listed on this page belong to their respective owners. Read More