SREEPRIYA
Sreepriya is registered with the Ministry of Corporate Affairs as a Director in Indian Companies. The DIN (Director Identification Number) of Sreepriya is 09147860.
Currently, he/she serves as a director in 2 Companies in India. The companies he/she is associated with are from various industries such as Finance etc.
Following are the directorship details of Sreepriya
NAME | INDUSTRY | INCORP. YEAR | COMP. STATUS | DESIGNATION | DATE OF APPOINTMENT | AS ON | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KEERTHANAM CHIT FUNDS PRIVATE LIMITED | Finance | 2021 | Active | Director | 29 November 2021 | 13 November 2022 | Buy financial reports |
CHETHALLUR VIKAS NIDHI LIMITED | Finance | 2020 | Active | Director | 20 April 2021 | 8 August 2024 | Buy financial reports |
Other individuals who might be associated with Sreepriya are Gopalakrishnan Erattu, Maneesha Eratt.
FAQ - Sreepriya
-
How many companies is he/she appointed as director?
Sreepriya serves as a director in 2 Companies in India.
-
What is the DIN of Sreepriya?
The DIN of Sreepriya is 09147860.
-
Which is the longest holding directorship of Sreepriya?
The longest directorship of Sreepriya is with CHETHALLUR VIKAS NIDHI LIMITED.
*Industry classification is inferred. If the company has changed line of business without intimating the Registrar or is a diversified business, classification may be different. We make no warranties about accuracy of industry classification
Tofler, TWS Systems Private Limited and its officers respect the Intellectual Property Rights of all people. Tofler makes no claim of ownership or affiliation with any trademark (REGISTERED OR UNREGISTERED) that forms part of any Company/LLP name listed on this page. Trademarks, if any, listed on this page belong to their respective owners. Read More