Sreelakshmi Biju
Sreelakshmi Biju is registered with the Ministry of Corporate Affairs as a Director in Indian Companies. The DIN (Director Identification Number) of Sreelakshmi Biju is 09166190.
Currently, he/she serves as a director in 2 Companies in India. The companies he/she is associated with are from various industries such as Trading etc.
Following are the directorship details of Sreelakshmi Biju
NAME | INDUSTRY | INCORP. YEAR | COMP. STATUS | DESIGNATION | DATE OF APPOINTMENT | AS ON | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DEEPAN FOOD PRODUCTS PRIVATE LIMITED | Trading | 2020 | Active | Director | 28 May 2021 | 16 December 2022 | Buy financial reports |
DEEPAN TRADESOLUTIONS PRIVATE LIMITED | Trading | 2018 | Active | Director | 5 May 2021 | 16 May 2023 | Buy financial reports |
Other individuals who might be associated with Sreelakshmi Biju are Nidheesh Raghavan Sundaran.
FAQ - Sreelakshmi Biju
-
How many companies is he/she appointed as director?
Sreelakshmi Biju serves as a director in 2 Companies in India.
-
What is the DIN of Sreelakshmi Biju?
The DIN of Sreelakshmi Biju is 09166190.
-
Which is the longest holding directorship of Sreelakshmi Biju?
The longest directorship of Sreelakshmi Biju is with DEEPAN TRADESOLUTIONS PRIVATE LIMITED.
*Industry classification is inferred. If the company has changed line of business without intimating the Registrar or is a diversified business, classification may be different. We make no warranties about accuracy of industry classification
Tofler, TWS Systems Private Limited and its officers respect the Intellectual Property Rights of all people. Tofler makes no claim of ownership or affiliation with any trademark (REGISTERED OR UNREGISTERED) that forms part of any Company/LLP name listed on this page. Trademarks, if any, listed on this page belong to their respective owners. Read More