SON KANWAR
Son Kanwar is registered with the Ministry of Corporate Affairs as a Director in Indian Companies. The DIN (Director Identification Number) of Son Kanwar is 08259485.
Currently, he/she serves as a director in 2 Companies in India. The companies he/she is associated with are from various industries such as Finance etc.
Following are the directorship details of Son Kanwar
NAME | INDUSTRY | INCORP. YEAR | COMP. STATUS | DESIGNATION | DATE OF APPOINTMENT | AS ON | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JBSURE INDIA NIDHI LIMITED | Finance | 2020 | Active | Director | 31 January 2020 | 7 August 2021 | Buy financial reports |
JBSUBLET INDIA NIDHI LIMITED | Finance | 2018 | Active | Director | 17 October 2018 | 26 October 2022 | Buy financial reports |
Other individuals who might be associated with Son Kanwar are Sajjan Kanwar, Pravinder Kumar, Dinesh Singh, Ranbir Singh.
FAQ - Son Kanwar
-
How many companies is he/she appointed as director?
Son Kanwar serves as a director in 2 Companies in India.
-
What is the DIN of Son Kanwar?
The DIN of Son Kanwar is 08259485.
-
Which is the longest holding directorship of Son Kanwar?
The longest directorship of Son Kanwar is with JBSUBLET INDIA NIDHI LIMITED.
*Industry classification is inferred. If the company has changed line of business without intimating the Registrar or is a diversified business, classification may be different. We make no warranties about accuracy of industry classification
Tofler, TWS Systems Private Limited and its officers respect the Intellectual Property Rights of all people. Tofler makes no claim of ownership or affiliation with any trademark (REGISTERED OR UNREGISTERED) that forms part of any Company/LLP name listed on this page. Trademarks, if any, listed on this page belong to their respective owners. Read More