SIYA RAM
Siya Ram is registered with the Ministry of Corporate Affairs as a Director in Indian Companies. The DIN (Director Identification Number) of Siya Ram is 08111621.
Currently, he/she serves as a director in 2 Companies in India. The companies he/she is associated with are from various industries such as Education etc.
Following are the directorship details of Siya Ram
NAME | INDUSTRY | INCORP. YEAR | COMP. STATUS | DESIGNATION | DATE OF APPOINTMENT | AS ON | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ASTRONOMY EDUCATION AND RESEARCH PRIVATE LIMITED | Education | 2018 | Active | Director | 16 April 2018 | 23 July 2022 | Buy financial reports |
SPACETRIX AEROSPACE PRIVATE LIMITED | Education | 2020 | Active | Director | 27 July 2020 | 20 May 2024 | Buy financial reports |
Other individuals who might be associated with Siya Ram are Sumit Kumar Jha, Sriram.
FAQ - Siya Ram
-
How many companies is he/she appointed as director?
Siya Ram serves as a director in 2 Companies in India.
-
What is the DIN of Siya Ram?
The DIN of Siya Ram is 08111621.
-
Which is the longest holding directorship of Siya Ram?
The longest directorship of Siya Ram is with ASTRONOMY EDUCATION AND RESEARCH PRIVATE LIMITED.
*Industry classification is inferred. If the company has changed line of business without intimating the Registrar or is a diversified business, classification may be different. We make no warranties about accuracy of industry classification
Tofler, TWS Systems Private Limited and its officers respect the Intellectual Property Rights of all people. Tofler makes no claim of ownership or affiliation with any trademark (REGISTERED OR UNREGISTERED) that forms part of any Company/LLP name listed on this page. Trademarks, if any, listed on this page belong to their respective owners. Read More