SIJO FRANCIS
Sijo Francis is registered with the Ministry of Corporate Affairs as a Director in Indian Companies. The DIN (Director Identification Number) of Sijo Francis is 06799112.
Currently, he/she serves as a director in 2 Companies in India. The companies he/she is associated with are from various industries such as Construction etc.
Following are the directorship details of Sijo Francis
NAME | INDUSTRY | INCORP. YEAR | COMP. STATUS | DESIGNATION | DATE OF APPOINTMENT | AS ON | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROSEZONE CONSTRUCTIONS & DEVELOPERS LLP | Construction | 2014 | Active | Designated Partner | 2 May 2014 | 26 February 2015 | Buy financial reports |
LA ROSA CRAFT AND DESIGNS LLP | Construction | 2017 | Active | Director | 2 February 2017 | 7 December 2018 | Buy financial reports |
Other individuals who might be associated with Sijo Francis are Tincy Varghese, Mercy.
FAQ - Sijo Francis
-
How many companies is he/she appointed as director?
Sijo Francis serves as a director in 2 Companies in India.
-
What is the DIN of Sijo Francis?
The DIN of Sijo Francis is 06799112.
-
Which is the longest holding directorship of Sijo Francis?
The longest directorship of Sijo Francis is with ROSEZONE CONSTRUCTIONS & DEVELOPERS LLP.
*Industry classification is inferred. If the company has changed line of business without intimating the Registrar or is a diversified business, classification may be different. We make no warranties about accuracy of industry classification
Tofler, TWS Systems Private Limited and its officers respect the Intellectual Property Rights of all people. Tofler makes no claim of ownership or affiliation with any trademark (REGISTERED OR UNREGISTERED) that forms part of any Company/LLP name listed on this page. Trademarks, if any, listed on this page belong to their respective owners. Read More