SHIVAM YADAV
Shivam Yadav is registered with the Ministry of Corporate Affairs as a Director in Indian Companies. The DIN (Director Identification Number) of Shivam Yadav is 08861217.
Currently, he/she serves as a director in 2 Companies in India. The companies he/she is associated with are from various industries such as Trading, etc.
Following are the directorship details of Shivam Yadav
NAME | INDUSTRY | INCORP. YEAR | COMP. STATUS | DESIGNATION | DATE OF APPOINTMENT | AS ON | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SHRI MAHAKAL GRAINS PRIVATE LIMITED | Trading | 2020 | Active | Director | 3 September 2020 | 25 July 2022 | Buy financial reports |
NAISHA PETROCHEM LLP | 2023 | Active | Director | 31 July 2023 | 1 August 2023 | Buy financial reports |
Other individuals who might be associated with Shivam Yadav are Sachin Nivruti Pote, Sahil Agarwal.
FAQ - Shivam Yadav
-
How many companies is he/she appointed as director?
Shivam Yadav serves as a director in 2 Companies in India.
-
What is the DIN of Shivam Yadav?
The DIN of Shivam Yadav is 08861217.
-
Which is the longest holding directorship of Shivam Yadav?
The longest directorship of Shivam Yadav is with SHRI MAHAKAL GRAINS PRIVATE LIMITED.
*Industry classification is inferred. If the company has changed line of business without intimating the Registrar or is a diversified business, classification may be different. We make no warranties about accuracy of industry classification
Tofler, TWS Systems Private Limited and its officers respect the Intellectual Property Rights of all people. Tofler makes no claim of ownership or affiliation with any trademark (REGISTERED OR UNREGISTERED) that forms part of any Company/LLP name listed on this page. Trademarks, if any, listed on this page belong to their respective owners. Read More