SHILPA JAIN
Shilpa Jain is registered with the Ministry of Corporate Affairs as a Director in Indian Companies. The DIN (Director Identification Number) of Shilpa Jain is 09100280.
Currently, he/she serves as a director in 2 Companies in India. The companies he/she is associated with are from various industries such as Education, etc.
Following are the directorship details of Shilpa Jain
NAME | INDUSTRY | INCORP. YEAR | COMP. STATUS | DESIGNATION | DATE OF APPOINTMENT | AS ON | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
VSJ EVENT TECHNOLOGY PRIVATE LIMITED | Education | 2021 | Active | Director | 10 March 2021 | 11 March 2023 | Buy financial reports |
LED SOLUTIONS DEL LLP | 2023 | Active | Director | 24 August 2023 | 19 September 2024 | Buy financial reports |
Other individuals who might be associated with Shilpa Jain are Vikrant Jain, Saurabh Tuli, Rajesh Khanna.
FAQ - Shilpa Jain
-
How many companies is he/she appointed as director?
Shilpa Jain serves as a director in 2 Companies in India.
-
What is the DIN of Shilpa Jain?
The DIN of Shilpa Jain is 09100280.
-
Which is the longest holding directorship of Shilpa Jain?
The longest directorship of Shilpa Jain is with VSJ EVENT TECHNOLOGY PRIVATE LIMITED.
*Industry classification is inferred. If the company has changed line of business without intimating the Registrar or is a diversified business, classification may be different. We make no warranties about accuracy of industry classification
Tofler, TWS Systems Private Limited and its officers respect the Intellectual Property Rights of all people. Tofler makes no claim of ownership or affiliation with any trademark (REGISTERED OR UNREGISTERED) that forms part of any Company/LLP name listed on this page. Trademarks, if any, listed on this page belong to their respective owners. Read More