SHIKHAR TANDON
Shikhar Tandon is registered with the Ministry of Corporate Affairs as a Director in Indian Companies. The DIN (Director Identification Number) of Shikhar Tandon is 08347494.
Currently, he/she serves as a director in 2 Companies in India. The companies he/she is associated with are from various industries such as , Trading etc.
Following are the directorship details of Shikhar Tandon
NAME | INDUSTRY | INCORP. YEAR | COMP. STATUS | DESIGNATION | DATE OF APPOINTMENT | AS ON | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nikss Gourmet LLP | 2022 | Active | Director | 1 December 2022 | 29 December 2022 | Buy financial reports | |
KOARE PRISM IMPEX ENGINEERING PRIVATE LIMITED | Trading | 2019 | Active | Director | 30 January 2019 | 3 February 2023 | Buy financial reports |
Other individuals who might be associated with Shikhar Tandon are Krishna Veni Bazari, Ishita Raksha.
FAQ - Shikhar Tandon
-
How many companies is he/she appointed as director?
Shikhar Tandon serves as a director in 2 Companies in India.
-
What is the DIN of Shikhar Tandon?
The DIN of Shikhar Tandon is 08347494.
-
Which is the longest holding directorship of Shikhar Tandon?
The longest directorship of Shikhar Tandon is with KOARE PRISM IMPEX ENGINEERING PRIVATE LIMITED.
*Industry classification is inferred. If the company has changed line of business without intimating the Registrar or is a diversified business, classification may be different. We make no warranties about accuracy of industry classification
Tofler, TWS Systems Private Limited and its officers respect the Intellectual Property Rights of all people. Tofler makes no claim of ownership or affiliation with any trademark (REGISTERED OR UNREGISTERED) that forms part of any Company/LLP name listed on this page. Trademarks, if any, listed on this page belong to their respective owners. Read More