SHIB LAL AGARWAL
Shib Lal Agarwal is registered with the Ministry of Corporate Affairs as a Director in Indian Companies. The DIN (Director Identification Number) of Shib Lal Agarwal is 00567784.
Currently, he/she serves as a director in 2 Companies in India. The companies he/she is associated with are from various industries such as Construction, Trading etc.
Following are the directorship details of Shib Lal Agarwal
NAME | INDUSTRY | INCORP. YEAR | COMP. STATUS | DESIGNATION | DATE OF APPOINTMENT | AS ON | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BALRAM ENCLAVE PRIVATE LIMITED | Construction | 2004 | Active | Director | 13 July 2022 | 24 October 2023 | Buy financial reports |
SLRL AGENCIES PRIVATE LIMITED | Trading | 1999 | Active | Director | 26 March 1999 | 22 April 2024 | Buy financial reports |
Other individuals who might be associated with Shib Lal Agarwal are Abha Devi Agarwal, Sumit Saraogi.
FAQ - Shib Lal Agarwal
-
How many companies is he/she appointed as director?
Shib Lal Agarwal serves as a director in 2 Companies in India.
-
What is the DIN of Shib Lal Agarwal?
The DIN of Shib Lal Agarwal is 00567784.
-
Which is the longest holding directorship of Shib Lal Agarwal?
The longest directorship of Shib Lal Agarwal is with SLRL AGENCIES PRIVATE LIMITED.
*Industry classification is inferred. If the company has changed line of business without intimating the Registrar or is a diversified business, classification may be different. We make no warranties about accuracy of industry classification
Tofler, TWS Systems Private Limited and its officers respect the Intellectual Property Rights of all people. Tofler makes no claim of ownership or affiliation with any trademark (REGISTERED OR UNREGISTERED) that forms part of any Company/LLP name listed on this page. Trademarks, if any, listed on this page belong to their respective owners. Read More