. SHAIK JILANI
. Shaik Jilani is registered with the Ministry of Corporate Affairs as a Director in Indian Companies. The DIN (Director Identification Number) of . Shaik Jilani is 09641630.
Currently, he/she serves as a director in 2 Companies in India. The companies he/she is associated with are from various industries such as , Finance etc.
Following are the directorship details of . Shaik Jilani
NAME | INDUSTRY | INCORP. YEAR | COMP. STATUS | DESIGNATION | DATE OF APPOINTMENT | AS ON | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
J2 WEALTH IMF LLP | 2023 | Active | Director | 7 August 2023 | 12 August 2023 | Buy financial reports | |
J2 WEALTH PRIVATE LIMITED | Finance | 2022 | Active | Director | 17 June 2022 | 13 August 2023 | Buy financial reports |
Other individuals who might be associated with . Shaik Jilani are Shaik Asha.
FAQ - . Shaik Jilani
-
How many companies is he/she appointed as director?
. Shaik Jilani serves as a director in 2 Companies in India.
-
What is the DIN of . Shaik Jilani?
The DIN of . Shaik Jilani is 09641630.
-
Which is the longest holding directorship of . Shaik Jilani?
The longest directorship of . Shaik Jilani is with J2 WEALTH PRIVATE LIMITED.
*Industry classification is inferred. If the company has changed line of business without intimating the Registrar or is a diversified business, classification may be different. We make no warranties about accuracy of industry classification
Tofler, TWS Systems Private Limited and its officers respect the Intellectual Property Rights of all people. Tofler makes no claim of ownership or affiliation with any trademark (REGISTERED OR UNREGISTERED) that forms part of any Company/LLP name listed on this page. Trademarks, if any, listed on this page belong to their respective owners. Read More