SHAGUN KUMAR
Shagun Kumar is registered with the Ministry of Corporate Affairs as a Director in Indian Companies. The DIN (Director Identification Number) of Shagun Kumar is 09284579.
Currently, he/she serves as a director in 2 Companies in India. The companies he/she is associated with are from various industries such as Trading etc.
Following are the directorship details of Shagun Kumar
NAME | INDUSTRY | INCORP. YEAR | COMP. STATUS | DESIGNATION | DATE OF APPOINTMENT | AS ON | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PURPLECROP PRIVATE LIMITED | Trading | 2021 | Not available for efiling | Director | 17 August 2021 | 18 August 2021 | Buy financial reports |
NISHRA RETAIL PRIVATE LIMITED | Trading | 2022 | Active | Director | 20 April 2022 | 21 April 2022 | Buy financial reports |
Other individuals who might be associated with Shagun Kumar are Nimish Ajay Ratnakar, Kaushalbhai Yogeshbhai Raichura.
FAQ - Shagun Kumar
-
How many companies is he/she appointed as director?
Shagun Kumar serves as a director in 2 Companies in India.
-
What is the DIN of Shagun Kumar?
The DIN of Shagun Kumar is 09284579.
-
Which is the longest holding directorship of Shagun Kumar?
The longest directorship of Shagun Kumar is with PURPLECROP PRIVATE LIMITED.
*Industry classification is inferred. If the company has changed line of business without intimating the Registrar or is a diversified business, classification may be different. We make no warranties about accuracy of industry classification
Tofler, TWS Systems Private Limited and its officers respect the Intellectual Property Rights of all people. Tofler makes no claim of ownership or affiliation with any trademark (REGISTERED OR UNREGISTERED) that forms part of any Company/LLP name listed on this page. Trademarks, if any, listed on this page belong to their respective owners. Read More