SEHZAD
Sehzad is registered with the Ministry of Corporate Affairs as a Director in Indian Companies. The DIN (Director Identification Number) of Sehzad is 09611050.
Currently, he/she serves as a director in 2 Companies in India. The companies he/she is associated with are from various industries such as Business Services etc.
Following are the directorship details of Sehzad
NAME | INDUSTRY | INCORP. YEAR | COMP. STATUS | DESIGNATION | DATE OF APPOINTMENT | AS ON | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
INTISAR DESERTDUNES PRIVATE LIMITED | Business Services | 2017 | Active | Director | 25 May 2022 | 29 July 2022 | Buy financial reports |
SANDARSHIKA COMMODITY PRIVATE LIMITED | Business Services | 2013 | Active | Director | 22 June 2022 | 7 May 2024 | Buy financial reports |
Other individuals who might be associated with Sehzad are Angad, Shiv Narayan Jaiswal.
FAQ - Sehzad
-
How many companies is he/she appointed as director?
Sehzad serves as a director in 2 Companies in India.
-
What is the DIN of Sehzad?
The DIN of Sehzad is 09611050.
-
Which is the longest holding directorship of Sehzad?
The longest directorship of Sehzad is with INTISAR DESERTDUNES PRIVATE LIMITED.
*Industry classification is inferred. If the company has changed line of business without intimating the Registrar or is a diversified business, classification may be different. We make no warranties about accuracy of industry classification
Tofler, TWS Systems Private Limited and its officers respect the Intellectual Property Rights of all people. Tofler makes no claim of ownership or affiliation with any trademark (REGISTERED OR UNREGISTERED) that forms part of any Company/LLP name listed on this page. Trademarks, if any, listed on this page belong to their respective owners. Read More