SAVITA MISRA
Savita Misra is registered with the Ministry of Corporate Affairs as a Director in Indian Companies. The DIN (Director Identification Number) of Savita Misra is 01175934.
Currently, he/she serves as a director in 2 Companies in India. The companies he/she is associated with are from various industries such as Trading, Finance etc.
Following are the directorship details of Savita Misra
NAME | INDUSTRY | INCORP. YEAR | COMP. STATUS | DESIGNATION | DATE OF APPOINTMENT | AS ON | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SREEDA VENTURES PRIVATE LIMITED | Trading | 2008 | Active | Director | 3 June 2010 | 10 May 2021 | Buy financial reports |
MISJA FINANCIAL SERVICES LIMITED | Finance | 1992 | Active | Director | 2 November 1998 | 29 August 2021 | Buy financial reports |
Other individuals who might be associated with Savita Misra are Rakesh Misra, Rajiv Mishra, Ritesh Kumar Agarwal.
FAQ - Savita Misra
-
How many companies is he/she appointed as director?
Savita Misra serves as a director in 2 Companies in India.
-
What is the DIN of Savita Misra?
The DIN of Savita Misra is 01175934.
-
Which is the longest holding directorship of Savita Misra?
The longest directorship of Savita Misra is with MISJA FINANCIAL SERVICES LIMITED.
*Industry classification is inferred. If the company has changed line of business without intimating the Registrar or is a diversified business, classification may be different. We make no warranties about accuracy of industry classification
Tofler, TWS Systems Private Limited and its officers respect the Intellectual Property Rights of all people. Tofler makes no claim of ownership or affiliation with any trademark (REGISTERED OR UNREGISTERED) that forms part of any Company/LLP name listed on this page. Trademarks, if any, listed on this page belong to their respective owners. Read More