SAVEENA LUCK
Saveena Luck is registered with the Ministry of Corporate Affairs as a Director in Indian Companies. The DIN (Director Identification Number) of Saveena Luck is 07342315.
Currently, he/she serves as a director in 2 Companies in India. The companies he/she is associated with are from various industries such as Computer Related Services, etc.
Following are the directorship details of Saveena Luck
NAME | INDUSTRY | INCORP. YEAR | COMP. STATUS | DESIGNATION | DATE OF APPOINTMENT | AS ON | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LIBRA RISING PRIVATE LIMITED | Computer Related Services | 2012 | Active | Director | 23 May 2016 | 22 February 2022 | Buy financial reports |
ZARRA HYDERABADI LLP | 2022 | Active | Director | 21 September 2022 | 11 October 2022 | Buy financial reports |
Other individuals who might be associated with Saveena Luck are Nimmagadda Mahesh.
FAQ - Saveena Luck
-
How many companies is he/she appointed as director?
Saveena Luck serves as a director in 2 Companies in India.
-
What is the DIN of Saveena Luck?
The DIN of Saveena Luck is 07342315.
-
Which is the longest holding directorship of Saveena Luck?
The longest directorship of Saveena Luck is with LIBRA RISING PRIVATE LIMITED.
*Industry classification is inferred. If the company has changed line of business without intimating the Registrar or is a diversified business, classification may be different. We make no warranties about accuracy of industry classification
Tofler, TWS Systems Private Limited and its officers respect the Intellectual Property Rights of all people. Tofler makes no claim of ownership or affiliation with any trademark (REGISTERED OR UNREGISTERED) that forms part of any Company/LLP name listed on this page. Trademarks, if any, listed on this page belong to their respective owners. Read More