SASANKA SEKHAR MONDAL
Sasanka Sekhar Mondal is registered with the Ministry of Corporate Affairs as a Director in Indian Companies. The DIN (Director Identification Number) of Sasanka Sekhar Mondal is 08826897.
Currently, he/she serves as a director in 2 Companies in India. The companies he/she is associated with are from various industries such as Construction, Trading etc.
Following are the directorship details of Sasanka Sekhar Mondal
NAME | INDUSTRY | INCORP. YEAR | COMP. STATUS | DESIGNATION | DATE OF APPOINTMENT | AS ON | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
TAURUS HEIGHTS PRIVATE LIMITED | Construction | 2007 | Active | Director | 11 August 2020 | 2 May 2022 | Buy financial reports |
LEADING MERCHANDISE PRIVATE LIMITED | Trading | 2010 | Active | Director | 12 September 2020 | 10 March 2023 | Buy financial reports |
Other individuals who might be associated with Sasanka Sekhar Mondal are Sudhir.
FAQ - Sasanka Sekhar Mondal
-
How many companies is he/she appointed as director?
Sasanka Sekhar Mondal serves as a director in 2 Companies in India.
-
What is the DIN of Sasanka Sekhar Mondal?
The DIN of Sasanka Sekhar Mondal is 08826897.
-
Which is the longest holding directorship of Sasanka Sekhar Mondal?
The longest directorship of Sasanka Sekhar Mondal is with TAURUS HEIGHTS PRIVATE LIMITED.
*Industry classification is inferred. If the company has changed line of business without intimating the Registrar or is a diversified business, classification may be different. We make no warranties about accuracy of industry classification
Tofler, TWS Systems Private Limited and its officers respect the Intellectual Property Rights of all people. Tofler makes no claim of ownership or affiliation with any trademark (REGISTERED OR UNREGISTERED) that forms part of any Company/LLP name listed on this page. Trademarks, if any, listed on this page belong to their respective owners. Read More