SAROJ KOTHARI
Saroj Kothari is registered with the Ministry of Corporate Affairs as a Director in Indian Companies. The DIN (Director Identification Number) of Saroj Kothari is 03110534.
Currently, he/she serves as a director in 2 Companies in India. The companies he/she is associated with are from various industries such as Finance etc.
Following are the directorship details of Saroj Kothari
NAME | INDUSTRY | INCORP. YEAR | COMP. STATUS | DESIGNATION | DATE OF APPOINTMENT | AS ON | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BINDAL FINSTOCK PVT LTD | Finance | 1993 | Active | Director | 25 August 2010 | 24 August 2022 | Buy financial reports |
SCROD TRADING AND INVESTMENT COMPANY | Finance | 1985 | Active | Director | 12 December 2017 | 27 November 2022 | Buy financial reports |
Other individuals who might be associated with Saroj Kothari are Sunil Tarachand Kothari.
FAQ - Saroj Kothari
-
How many companies is he/she appointed as director?
Saroj Kothari serves as a director in 2 Companies in India.
-
What is the DIN of Saroj Kothari?
The DIN of Saroj Kothari is 03110534.
-
Which is the longest holding directorship of Saroj Kothari?
The longest directorship of Saroj Kothari is with BINDAL FINSTOCK PVT LTD.
*Industry classification is inferred. If the company has changed line of business without intimating the Registrar or is a diversified business, classification may be different. We make no warranties about accuracy of industry classification
Tofler, TWS Systems Private Limited and its officers respect the Intellectual Property Rights of all people. Tofler makes no claim of ownership or affiliation with any trademark (REGISTERED OR UNREGISTERED) that forms part of any Company/LLP name listed on this page. Trademarks, if any, listed on this page belong to their respective owners. Read More